THE EDGAR E LAWLEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving grants to charitable bodies for the provision of medical care, services to children and the aged, the advancement of medicine and for educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 February 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HAROLD COOKE JP | Chair |
|
||||||
LAURA LUCY COOKE | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE COATES | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN COOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANK JACKSON OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £223.67k | £215.92k | £205.71k | £214.45k | £195.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £253.57k | £237.20k | £242.60k | £258.39k | £233.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO MEDICINE, TO NECESSITOUS ELDERLY PERSONS, AND TO EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES WITH REFERENCE TO THE ARTS, COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
P.O.BOX 456
ESHER
KT10 1DP
- Phone:
- 01372805760
- Email:
- edgarelawley@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window