SPITAL ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 201595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing Housing for elderly ladies

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £19,115
Total expenditure: £14,660

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 February 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SPITAL TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hazel Ellis Trustee 27 September 2018
None on record
Henry Besley Trustee 02 March 2015
None on record
Elaine Fenton Trustee 10 March 2014
THE BESOM IN TAUNTON
Received: On time
IRENE PENELOPE REEVES Trustee
None on record
CHERYL BIRKETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.42k £12.67k £13.94k £14.89k £19.11k
Total expenditure £16.91k £9.88k £6.68k £24.16k £14.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
23 Sweeting Close
Creech St. Michael
TAUNTON
TA3 5FB
Phone:
01823442714
Website:

No information available