Financial history CAMSIGHT

Charity number: 201640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.28m £536.32k £374.10k £500.85k £544.73k
Total expenditure £561.83k £568.72k £658.05k £688.85k £842.21k
Income from government contracts £87.00k £87.00k £87.00k £132.13k £145.16k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £992.46k £237.35k N/A £165.03k £61.32k
Income - Other trading activities £3.88k £120 N/A £3.11k £4.00k
Income - Charitable activities £261.93k £287.46k N/A £306.70k £447.16k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.52k £11.38k N/A £26.02k £32.25k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.28k £131.96k N/A £84.91k £27.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £512.91k £525.39k N/A £661.62k £813.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds £48.93k £43.33k N/A £27.24k £29.00k
Expenditure - Governance £31.34k £141.16k N/A £21.64k £27.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.19k £3.39k N/A £5.12k £2.98k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0