Accounts and annual returns THE EAST KENT ORTHOPAEDIC RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 201659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 11 February 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 February 2025 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 07 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 February 2023 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required