THE ROYAL ALBERT AND ST SWITHUN'S HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouses accomodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 09 January 1967: Standard registration
- R A H (Working name)
- ROYAL ALBERT CHILDRENS HOME (Previous name)
- ROYAL ALBERT HOMES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM JAMES SIMPSON MBE | Chair | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Fitzmaurice | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Atif Sadiq | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Councillor Abdul Jabbar Riaz | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Clarke Mr | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Major | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bannister | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Steve John MacKay | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ARMSDEN THOMAS | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MIKE ELLISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEVERLEY ANN THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.73k | £157.61k | £160.42k | £165.07k | £169.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.98k | £119.14k | £162.91k | £201.67k | £185.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19/12/2000
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT FO THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE; AND C) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 18 WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN ACCORDANCE WITH CLAUSE 28(2) OF THIS SCHEME
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF WORCESTER
Linked charities
- 09 January 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Norton Close
Worcester
WR5 3EY
- Phone:
- 01905355659
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window