W W F - U K
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 23 November 1961: Standard registration
- 15 January 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 January 2004: Funds transferred to 1081247 WWF - UK
- WORLD WIDE FUND FOR NATURE (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEEDS OF TRUST DATED 23RD NOVEMBER 1961 AND 10TH MARCH 1970 AND 12TH NOVEMBER 1992 SCHEMES OF 17TH JUNE 1974,18TH JANUARY 1979 AND 24TH SEPTEMBER 1991. AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 16 AUGUST 1995.
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH BY THE SUPPORT OF STUDIES AND OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND THE PUBLICATION OF EDUCATIONAL AND SCIENTIFIC WORKS THEREON AND BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUCH STUDIES AND ACTIVITIES BY MEANS OF THE CONSERVATION OF WORLD FAUNA AND FLORA, WATER, SOILS AND OTHER NATURAL RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.