THE COLLEGE OF MATRONS

Charity number: 201720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The College provides almshouse accommodation for eligible women, preferably widows or daughters of Ministers of the Church of England, in The Close, Salisbury and at St John's Priory, Wilton. Applicants must be resident within the dioceses of Salisbury, Winchester, Portsmouth, Bath & Wells, Exeter or Truro.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £238,531
Total expenditure: £296,124

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Dorset
  • Hampshire
  • Portsmouth City
  • Somerset
  • Southampton City
  • Torbay
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 1962: Standard registration
  • 13 March 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE COLLEGE OF MATRONS FOUNDED BY SETH, LORD BISHOP OF SARUM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Revd Canon Edward Cleasby Probert Chair
BISHOP WORDSWORTH EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY SALISBURY
Received: On time
Niki Cartwright Trustee 15 November 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Anne Ogilvie Trustee 17 July 2024
UROSTOMY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CELIA JANE LAX Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
ROY BEXON Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
ALASTAIR RICHARD MALCOLM Trustee 18 November 2022
None on record
SARAH MARY WHEELER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £206.14k £212.14k £215.14k £230.77k £238.53k
Total expenditure £277.23k £327.04k £276.25k £234.99k £296.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 10 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURE DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1693 (PR 26 P 414), AS AMENDED ON THE 25TH OF JULY 1994 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF SALISBURY AND EXETER
Registration history
  • 12 January 1962 : Standard registration
  • 13 March 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
42A THE CLOSE
SALISBURY
SP1 2EL
Phone:
01722321558