PROBUS UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 201723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Renting of Fields & Allotments held by the Charity and distributing the net income to the Poor Trust & Probus PCC.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,448
Total expenditure: £10,322

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 January 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TREDENHAM CHARITY LANDS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAYMOND SCHOFIELD Chair
None on record
Peter David Keam Trustee 31 March 2020
None on record
Roger Gluyas Trustee 07 March 2019
None on record
Nicholas Gillard Trustee 07 March 2019
KING GEORGE'S FIELD
Received: On time
James Harvey Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record
JEAN DANYLUK Trustee
None on record
BARBARA ANN HONEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £59.14k £5.60k £15.20k £5.89k £5.45k
Total expenditure £13.08k £6.63k £9.50k £11.24k £10.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE 29TH AUGUST 1911.
Charitable objects
FOR THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF PROBUS
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF PROBUS
Registration history
  • 15 January 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Foxleigh
Treviglas Lane
Probus
Truro
TR2 4LH
Phone:
01726883614
Website:

No information available