ALBERT CASANOVA BALLARD DECEASED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants can only be made to individuals and organisations living or operating within the city of Plymouth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 26 February 1962: Standard registration
- A C BALLARD DECEASED TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL CONFUE | Chair | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy-Hannah Hayes | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lippett | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
LYNN SMITH | Trustee | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEONARD NORRIS MBE | Trustee | 12 March 1998 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.51k | £41.25k | £38.83k | £40.24k | £39.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.63k | £49.60k | £40.77k | £57.54k | £48.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 21 April 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 21 April 2024 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEVENTH CODICIL (DATED 10TH JUNE 1940 TO WILL) PROBATE GRANTED 7TH OCTOBER 1948
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR BOYS:- AIR DEFENCE SQUADRON, PLYMOUTH. PLYMOUTH SECONDARY AND CENTRAL SCHOOLS. ORGANISATIONS AND CLUBS IN PLYMOUTH. BALLARD INSTITUTE, PLYMOUTH. RESIDING WITHIN SEVEN MILES FROM BALLARD INSTITUTE. TO PARENTS OF SCHOLARS WHO HOLD SCHOLARSHIPS TO SECONDARY SCHOOLS. DISTRIBUTION TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS IN PLYMOUTH. CONTINUANCE OF EDUCATION OF BOYS FORMERLY ASSISTED BY TESTATOR RE-EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
PLYMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 HOTHAM PLACE
PLYMOUTH
PL1 5NE
- Phone:
- 01822854457
- Email:
- ballardplymouth@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window