HATHERLEIGH PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 201770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of housing for elderly, poor or disabled people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £15,230
Total expenditure: £6,152

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DIXON'S COURT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Trenaman Chair
HATHERLEIGH SPORTS FIELD
Received: On time
WEST DEVON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Paul Sanders Trustee 22 February 2024
None on record
Michael Robin Chavasse Fielding Jones Trustee 09 March 2023
None on record
Lynn Strawbridge Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Rev Leigh Winsbury Trustee 13 March 2019
HATHERLEIGH PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Recently registered
Robin Antony Wonnacott Trustee 19 October 2017
HATHERLEIGH PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Recently registered
HATHERLEIGH SILVER BAND
Recently registered
Patrick John Derek Kimber Trustee 18 October 2016
None on record
PATRICIA FRANCES VICK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.81k £14.07k £14.45k £14.09k £15.23k
Total expenditure £41.73k £4.98k £12.14k £11.82k £6.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 17 NOVEMBER 1953 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 5 MAY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ALMSHOUSES
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HATHERLEIGH
Registration history
  • 22 December 1961 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
3 VICTORIA ROAD
HATHERLEIGH
OKEHAMPTON
EX20 3JG
Phone:
01837810786
Website:

No information available