THE TRANQUILITY HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make grants through diocesan bishops to assist clergy with holiday expenses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 October 1962: Standard registration
- THE CLERGY REST HOME (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carrick George McIlwraith Johnson | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana May Fitch | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Venerable Douglas Dettmer | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN Berrow | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Roger John Carlton | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER GOLDSMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL HEWSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.20k | £26.71k | £31.10k | £31.77k | £29.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.88k | £24.44k | £37.79k | £21.00k | £40.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 May 2025 | 456 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 May 2025 | 456 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 28TH MARCH 1988 AND SCHEME OF 1ST NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS FOR MEMBERS OF THE CLERGY OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE RESIDENT IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holwell Cottage
Middlemoor
TAVISTOCK
Devon
PL19 9DY
- Phone:
- 07850982975
- Email:
- tranquility201815@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window