ABBEY LAWN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To secure for the public benefit, the preservation, protection and improvement of listed buildings adjoining Tewkesbury Abbey. To educate the public in the history architecture and natural history of the area around Tewkesbury by the running of a museum. To provide a community and pleasure garden for the residents of Tewkesbury and its visitors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £254 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 January 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABBEY LAWN TRUSTEE COMPANY LIMITED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £223.66k | £223.69k | £207.94k | £225.24k | £254.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.64k | £224.32k | £255.75k | £292.60k | £262.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £62.48k | £5.75k | N/A | £254 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 09/08/2005
Charitable objects
A) TO SECURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE PRIMARY AREA OF BENEFIT AND THEREAFTER, AND AT THE TRUSTEES' DISCRETION, IN THE WIDER AREA OF BENEFIT; B) TO PRESERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL, AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST IN THE PRIMARY AREA OF BENEFIT AND THEREAFTER, AND AT THE TRUSTEES' DISCRETION, IN THE WIDER AREA OF BENEFIT; C) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE, NATURAL HISTORY AND GEOGRAPHY OF THE WIDER AREA OF BENEFIT, INPARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF ONE OR MORE MUSEUMS IN TEWKESBURY; D) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING, AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE WIDER AREA OF BENEFIT; E) TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY AND PLEASURE GARDEN FOR THE RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF TEWKESBURY AND PERSONS VISITING TEWKESBURY; F) TO PROVIDE ACCOMMODATION FOR CLERGY AND OTHERS CONNECTED WITH THE SERVICES OF TEWKESBURY ABBEY CHURCH; G) TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, PRESERVATION, INSURANCE AND CARE OF THE FABRIC OF THE TEWKESBURY ABBEY CHURCH AND ITS GOODS AND ORNAMENTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MAKING GRANTS FOR SUCH PURPOSES TO THE FRIENDS OF TEWKESBURY ABBEY (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 211236).
Area of benefit
TEWKESBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
John Yorke
Forthampton Court
Forthampton
Gloucester
GL19 4RD
- Phone:
- 01684292440
- Email:
- yorke@forthampton.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window