TOWN ESTATE (BARRINGTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty in Barrington
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 07 February 1962: Standard registration
- TOWN ESTATE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev FELICITY ANNE COUCH | Chair | 20 September 2012 |
|
|||||
RICHARD TURNILL | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA POTTER | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN DAY | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Northrop | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MARGARET SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY IRENE HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES BURTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.98k | £3.29k | £2.81k | £2.36k | £2.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.06k | £1.49k | £2.34k | £600 | £2.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 12TH FEBRUARY 1980
Charitable objects
IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN BARRINGTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BARRINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Mill Lane
Barrington
Cambridge
CB22 7QY
- Phone:
- 01223870192
- Email:
- wendyih@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window