HAMBLEDON (SURREY) ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of almshouses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 April 1962: Standard registration
- 21 November 1995: Removed
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MICHAEL POPE FALK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stewart Frank Payne | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Sean Dennis Sinnott | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Darbyshire | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Duncton | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID JENKINS | Trustee | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON DOMINIC KENT TAYLOR | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.11k | £15.06k | £15.55k | £14.93k | £15.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.14k | £5.50k | £4.97k | £11.78k | £7.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 JULY 1892 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 27 AUGUST 1907, 17 JULY 1914, 4 SEPTEMBER 1945, 6 MARCH 1963 AND 28 JULY 2010.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR, AGED, OR INFIRM PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE PARISH OF HAMBLEDON FOR NOT LESS THAN 2 YEARS, AND STIPTENDS FOR THE SAME.
Area of benefit
HAMBLEDON PARISH
Linked charities
- 06 April 1962 : Standard registration
- 21 November 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHIPTON HILL
WOODLANDS ROAD
HAMBLEDON
GODALMING
GU8 4HL
- Phone:
- 01428 683863
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window