PORTSMOUTH ASSOCIATION FOR THE WELFARE OF THE DEAF AND DUMB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the mental, moral and physical welfare of the deaf and dumb.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 22 September 1966: Standard registration
- PORTSMOUTH DEAF ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR JEFFREY HOWL | Chair | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
GIna Perryman | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Miche JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.83k | £49.02k | £44.02k | £24.70k | £31.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.46k | £24.20k | £19.06k | £27.67k | £40.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS SET OUT AND PRINTED IN THE ANNUAL REPORT OF 1960 AS AMENDED 28 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE WELFARE OF THE DEAF AND DUMB.
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
200 West Street
Portchester
FAREHAM
PO16 9XQ
- Phone:
- 07450241773
- Email:
- DMJ020707@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window