Accounts and annual returns MARY DYER'S CHARITY

Charity number: 201926
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 24 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 26 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 13 January 2009 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted