THE SOMERSET ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the study of archaeology, natural history and history, with particular reference to the historic County of Somerset, in such ways, including publications and information technology, as the Board of Trustees may deem appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,283 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 April 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lizzie Induni | Chair | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Keys | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Jill Doreen Strobridge | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN NICHOLSON | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Nigel Pearce | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Marlay Spencer | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARTIN LEONARD WILLIAM SALZER | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARIE WEBSTER | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.91k | £80.81k | £87.49k | £53.94k | £434.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.19k | £99.60k | £125.46k | £39.24k | £67.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.57k | N/A | £1.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 20TH JANUARY 1890. RULES OF 1959 AS AMENDED MAY 1971, 18 AUGUST 1975, 12 MAY 1979, 19 MAY 1984, 20 JUNE 1992, 28 MAY 1994, 19 MAY 2001, 18 MAY 2002, 17 MAY 2003 AND 19 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED 17 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED ON 02 DEC 2017 as amended on 07 Dec 2019 as amended on 16 Jul 2022 as amended on 20 May 2023 as amended on 04 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF ARCHAEOLOGY, NATURAL HISTORY AND HISTORY, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF SOMERSET, IN SUCH WAYS, INCLUDING PUBLICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, AS THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES MAY DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SOMERSET
Linked charities
- 06 April 1991 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Somerset Heritage Centre
Brunel Way
Norton Fitzwarren
Taunton
TA2 6SF
- Phone:
- 01823272429
- Email:
- office@sanhs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window