SIR JOHN JACOB'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide 10 Almshouses in accordance with the founders wishes and as varied by the Charity Comminssion scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 22 December 1961: Standard registration
- SIR JOHN JACOBS ALMSHOUSES (Working name)
- THE ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CHARLES DUMMER | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Joyce Gray | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SEBASTIAN GERALD MOLESWORTH KINDERSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACKIE HOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.00k | £57.00k | £60.45k | £59.00k | £68.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.00k | £36.00k | £55.69k | £41.00k | £33.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11/07/1958 AS AMENDED ON 09/08/1974 AS AMENDED ON 26/01/1984 AS AMENDED ON 16/09/1996 AS AMENDED ON 09/07/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WIDOWS OF GOOD CHARACTER RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF GAMLINGAY.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF GAMLINGAY.
Linked charities
- 22 December 1961 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR BARN
EAST HATLEY
SANDY
SG19 3JA
- Phone:
- 01767651982
- Email:
- skindersley@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window