SOUTH MILTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing venue for village organisations & other groups such as playgroup, dance society holding fund raising activities hiring hall for private functions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £498 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 02 February 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL INSTITUTE AND READING ROOM (Previous name)
- VILLAGE INSTITUTE AND READING ROOM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlie Lott | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Harding | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Halmshaw | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Day | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Wallace | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Burn | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Harding | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICK TOWNSEND | Trustee | 05 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ROBERT COLLYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.92k | £26.96k | £10.05k | £13.05k | £12.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.64k | £8.86k | £14.04k | £9.80k | £13.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.91k | £2.10k | N/A | £498 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 22N D AUGUST 1916 UV 193 P.24
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS OF PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SOUTH MILTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stanley Park
South Milton
KINGSBRIDGE
Devon
TQ7 3JW
- Phone:
- 07722627740
- Email:
- steve_harding@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window