CHURCH LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Charity is to pursue the religious and other charitable purposes of the Church of England, within the ecclesiastical parish of St. Michael, Tilehurst
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 02 February 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elizabeth Ratcliffe | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Bardwell | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.48k | £40.05k | £47.45k | £47.45k | £54.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.01k | £41.44k | £13.14k | £13.14k | £28.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2023 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2023 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2022 | 507 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2022 | 507 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 25TH MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL, TILEHURST
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL, TILEHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Juniper Way
Tilehurst
Reading
RG31 6NB
- Phone:
- 0118 942 7331
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window