BOYNE HILL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of almshouse accommodation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 25 September 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND JEREMY MICHAEL HARRIS | Chair |
|
||||||||
MICHAEL ROLAND MOSS | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Stephen John Foley | Trustee | 24 April 2024 | ||||||||
John Bolodeoku | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
RELF CLARK | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.47k | £24.45k | £23.05k | £23.05k | £22.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.46k | £25.46k | £22.44k | £22.44k | £18.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 December 2020 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 25 SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WOMEN OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF MAIDENHEAD AND WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WITH A PREFERENCE FOR SUCH WOMEN WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF OR HAVE AT ANY TIME BEEN INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, BOYNE HILL
Area of benefit
THE FORMER BOROUGH OF MAIDENHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodstock
Boyn Hill Avenue
Maidenhead
SL6 4HA
- Phone:
- 01628673884
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window