THE KIMBOLTON TRUST 1986

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of need of people living in the Parish of Kimbolton and Stonely by making grants of money for health care, housing needs or educational purposes. Also donations to assist the running of .clubs and organisations for all age groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 29 December 1961: Standard registration
- KIMBOLTON PAROCHIAL CHARITIES 1986 (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip Michael Howson | Chair | 11 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Adrian Dack | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Seabrook | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEITH HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 20 November 2001 |
|
|||||
ROY BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £6.90k | £6.65k | £6.80k | £7.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.10k | £3.07k | £8.76k | £2.77k | £6.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 01 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 2 JUNE 1987 as amended on 14 May 2018
Charitable objects
(1) 50P TO THE VICAR FOR PREACHING A SERMON ON ST. THOMAS'S DAY IN EVERY YEAR. (2) 50P TO THE VICAR FOR PREACHING A SERMON ON 1ST SEPTEMBER IN EVERY YEAR. RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF KIMBOLTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KIMBOLTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Constables Leys
Kimbolton
HUNTINGDON
PE28 0JG
- Phone:
- 01480860055
- Email:
- kimboltontrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window