Linked charities SAINT ALDATE'S PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Charity number: 202007
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 7 DECEMBER 1937 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 29 MARCH 1960 AND 8 AUGUST 1985
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR IN THE CITY OF OXFORD WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE ANCIENT PARISH OF ST ALDATE
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
- 19 January 1962 : Standard registration
- 27 April 2000 : Removed
- 27 April 2000 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.