NONENTITIES SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of live theatre for the people and district of Wyre Forest
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £660 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 13 February 1962: Standard registration
- "NONENTITIES" SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY ALBERT NEWBOULD | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|||||
John Gaston | Trustee | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Colin Young | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.68k | £55.42k | £111.38k | £135.19k | £162.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.39k | £52.17k | £69.63k | £85.47k | £111.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.99k | £23.62k | £250 | N/A | £660 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2KTH JUNE 1945, AND SUPPLEMENTARY DECLARATIONS OF TRUST DATED 19 NOVEMBER 1951 AND 16 JULY 1970
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY SHALL BE INSTITUTED FOR THE PURPOSE OF LITERATURE OR THE FINE ARTS EXCLUSIVELY AND TO FOUND A THEATRE FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE DRAMA AND DRAMATIC ART AND TO ENCOURAGE AN INTEREST IN THE DRAMA THROUGH THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS.
Area of benefit
KIDDERMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rose Theatre
Chester Road North
KIDDERMINSTER
DY10 2RX
- Phone:
- 01562 743745
- Email:
- admin@rosetheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window