THE VERNON AND BOURNE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial assistance to residents of Shrawley for reasons of hardship or to pursue further education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 08 December 1961: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Westwood | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELSIE BENDALL | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
LUCY HONOUR EDWARDS | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH DRING | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE FREEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL JOSEPH WHITMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHERYL ELIZABETH DORRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VANESSA CLAIRE JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.03k | £2.07k | £2.13k | £2.14k | £2.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £2.20k | £2.00k | £2.05k | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 02/02/1977 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/11/2012
Charitable objects
1. A YEARLY SUM NOT EXCEEDING ú80 (OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE COMMISSIONERS APPROVE FROM TIME TO TIME) OUT OF THE INCOME OF THE VERNON AND BOURNE CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. 2.THE RESIDUE OF THE YEARLY INCOME OF THE VERNON AND BOURNE CHARITY FOR RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME OF 2 FEBRUARY 1977).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SHRAWLEY.
Linked charities
- 08 December 1961 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spring Cottage
Shrawley
WORCESTER
WR6 6TP
- Phone:
- 07810634544
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window