BOW UNITED ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITIES

Charity Number: 202062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support bow village organisations by making financial donations annually. We would consider contributions to individuals if sought.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 10 October 2023

Total income: £449
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 January 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BOW UNITED ELEMOSNARY CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRIS LEWIS Chair
None on record
Carole Thomas Trustee 11 May 2024
BOW VILLAGE HALL AND FIELD
Received: On time
CREDITON & DISTRICT U3A
Recently registered
CREDITON & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
Doreen Susan May Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
Kenneth Earnest Frank Harris Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
DAVID JOHN HAYMAN Trustee
DEVON UNITED MISSIONARY OFFERING
Received: On time
REVEREND COLIN NORMAN SMALLACOMBE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/10/2019 10/10/2020 10/10/2021 10/10/2022 10/10/2023
Total gross income £405 £412 £420 £435 £449
Total expenditure £200 £200 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 October 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2022 22 May 2024 286 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2021 22 May 2024 651 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2020 30 April 2024 994 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1753 days
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 20 NOVEMBER 1914
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF BOW.
Area of benefit
PARISH BOW
Registration history
  • 18 January 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Butterlands Park Farm
Bow
CREDITON
Devon
EX17 6JD
Phone:
07999711950
Website:

No information available