Financial history THE CHARITY OF ELIZABETH BEAUMONT

Charity number: 202065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.95k £5.98k £6.10k £6.40k £6.84k
Total expenditure £1.20k £10.32k £5.70k £5.80k £2.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A