Trustees BLANCHMINSTER TRUST
Charity number: 202118

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP MICHAEL WALTER | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Moss | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Adams | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Irene Gliddon | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
IAN MICHAEL SALTERN | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY RICHARD JAMES | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENISE YVONNE WELLINGTON | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LAMBLE | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS NICHOLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE ANN NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OWEN ARTHUR MAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA MAY SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEONARD MICHAEL JAMES TOZER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.