HOME OF COMFORT FOR INVALIDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's activities have been transferred to a new incorporated charity ('Home of Comfort, 1163224'). They were: Management of a Nursing Home for the sick, providing accommodation, personal and nursing care for the elderly. The provision of grants for those without funds to support their own care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 19 February 1962: Standard registration
- HOME OF COMFORT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Home of Comfort (CIO) | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £569.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.19m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £18.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.34m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £2.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH MAY 1909 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 13 JANUARY 1997 as amended on 13 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
A NURSING HOME FOR THE SICK AND TERMINALLY ILL. PREFERENCE TO BE GIVEN TO MINISTERS OF RELIGION DEACONESSES AND OTHER WORKERS CONNECTED WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home of Comfort
17 Victoria Grove
SOUTHSEA
PO5 1NF
- Phone:
- 02392730063
- Email:
- email@homeofcomfort.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window