HOSPITAL OR ALMSHOUSES OF DOROTHY ELIZABETH PICKERING AND FRANCES BYRD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Northamptonshire rural village location providing accommodation to needy spinisters and widows within the Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 21 May 1962: Standard registration
- TRUSTEES OF PICKERING BYRDS CHARITY (Working name)
- HOSPITAL OR ALMSHOUSES OF DOROTHY ELIZABETH PICKERING AND FRANCES BYRD AND OTHER CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Newbold | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Bosworth | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA PRESTWICH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN JEFFRIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES WILCOX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.48k | £37.52k | £91.97k | £73.10k | £33.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.17k | £51.00k | £49.50k | £102.99k | £56.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6 JUNE 1882 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 3 JULY 1896, 28 FEBRUARY 1972 AND 8 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR SPINSTERS OR WIDOWS WHO WERE BORN IN THE PARISH OF TITCHMARSH OR ARE RESIDENT IN THE SAID PARISH AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT. FAILING THAT, APPLICATIONS FROM ALDWINCLE, CLOPTON, PILTON, STOKE DOYLE, ACHURCH, THORPE AND WADENHOE MAY BE CONSIDERED.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TITCHMARSH
Linked charities
- 21 May 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 NENE VIEW
ISLIP
KETTERING
NN14 3LD
- Phone:
- 07960036894
- Email:
- emmamorehen@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window