THE KING'S NORTON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 202225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Operates within the boundary of the former parish of King's Norton in Warwickshire and the West Midlands. Provides small grants to individuals to alleviate poverty and educational support for individuals living within the ancient boundary of the Parish of King's Norton (larger than the current ecclesiastical boundary of the parish of the same name)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,966
Total expenditure: £9,611

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 1962: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 26 June 2017: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Larry Wright Chair 10 November 2016
None on record
Rev Jayne Barbara Crooks Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Rev Magdalen Mary Smith Trustee 20 February 2023
The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Moseley
Received: On time
Debbie Clancy Trustee 17 December 2019
None on record
Rev Amanda Featherstone Trustee 20 June 2019
BISHOP HALL'S NORTHFIELD TRUST
Received: On time
ANNETTE ROSALIND DICKERS JP Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.57k £8.03k £8.93k £10.82k £10.97k
Total expenditure £10.27k £8.74k £6.25k £9.08k £9.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 4 MAY 1915 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 4 MARCH 1924 AND 26 AUGUST 1969
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF KINGS NORTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF KINGS NORTON
Registration history
  • 23 January 1962 : Standard registration
  • 09 June 2017 : Removed
  • 26 June 2017 : Re-registered

Contact information

Address:
THE RECTORY
273 PERSHORE ROAD SOUTH
KINGS NORTON
BIRMINGHAM
B30 3EX
Phone:
0121 458 3289