ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SURREY EAST BRANCH

Charity number: 202280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing accommodation and necessary veterinary care for animals rescued by the RSPCA; including neutering, micro-chipping and care of these animals. Financial assistance to owners who cannot afford to pay for their animals veterinary treatment and/or neutering. Visiting the homes of potential adopters. Supporting the work of regional RSPCA centres

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £120,532
Total expenditure: £57,626

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 January 1962: Standard registration
  • 24 October 2024: Funds received from 202399 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA SURREY EAST BRANCH (Working name)
  • RSPCA - SURREY EAST BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA -EAST SURREY BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Osborne Chair 20 February 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SURREY EAST BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Charlotte Anne Terese Parkes Trustee 15 October 2024
None on record
Kate Caulkin Trustee 15 September 2022
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SURREY EAST BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Susan Dalton Trustee 19 October 2017
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SURREY EAST BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
SARA KORTENRAY Trustee 29 October 2011
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SURREY EAST BRANCH CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £30.85k £49.67k £32.79k £63.30k £120.53k
Total expenditure £34.80k £37.38k £18.87k £32.92k £57.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RSPCA Surrey East Branch
C/O RSPCA Headquarters
Parkside Building
Chart Way
HORSHAM
RH12 1GY
Phone:
07394078180