Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING CENTRE
Charity Number: 1105044-1
Linked charity
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 21 OCT 1957
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 FEB 2018
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE DEAF, PARTIALLY DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING OF THE CITY OF OXFORD AND ITS DIOCESE.
Area of benefit
THE CITY AND DIOCESE OF OXFORD
Registration history
- 27 March 1962: Standard registration
- 12 February 2009: Funds transferred to 1112272 OXFORD DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING CENTRE
Other names
- OXFORD SIGN LANGUAGE INTERPRETING SERVICE (Working name)
- THE NEW CENTRE FOR THE DEAF & HARD OF HEARING (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.