THE POUND GREEN AND BUTTON-OAK COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide sevices and active facilities including a place of central focus and any communial activity for the benefit of the local Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 07 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rodney Crawford | Chair | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Pugh | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amber Walley | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Peckham | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Slade | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mills | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Hall | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
GAIL TWEEDALE | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Aston | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin Amor | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Wickham | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Val Gardner | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TWEEDALE | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.31k | £18.91k | £12.60k | £5.60k | £3.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.01k | £8.72k | £7.73k | £4.59k | £6.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 13 APR 2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 APR 2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
POUND GREEN AND BUTTON-OAK
Contact information
- Address:
-
DREAMSKERRY
POUND GREEN
ARLEY
BEWDLEY
DY12 3LB
- Phone:
- 01299404172
- Email:
- JOHNTWEEDALE333@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window