POOR'S ALLOTMENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides and manages allotments in the village of Standlake for the use of local residents. It also gives grants to individuals and organisations such as schools, scouts, youth clubs etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 January 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Gaffney | Chair | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Gordon Grew | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Anthony Johnson | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Spencer | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stephen Willis | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £834 | £876 | £862 | £1.07k | £1.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £770 | £218 | £675 | £1.19k | £671 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 27TH APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
(1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS AND IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY: (A) FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED. (B) IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING EQUIPMENT OF THE LAND APPROPRIATED AS AFORESAID AS A RECREATION GROUND OR ON ANY OTHER RECREATION GROUND TO WHICH THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF STANDLAKE HAVE ACCESS. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE SCHEME.
Area of benefit
STANDLAKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 The Green
Standlake
Witney
Oxfordshire
OX29 7SD
- Phone:
- 01628530286
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window