THE PETTIT CHARITY

Charity Number: 202378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is established for the advancement of Christian religion, teaching, repair of churches, relief of the aged, poor and impotent of any denomination, for the advancement and propagation of education and the provision of facilities for recreation chiefly relating to Northamptonshire. The charity holds various investments and receives income from them. There are no other activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,137
Total expenditure: £3,609

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE PETTIT TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSALIND MARY LUND Chair
None on record
David Christopher Burgess Trustee 24 August 2012
None on record
Dr Andrew John Burgess Trustee 24 August 2012
None on record
GEORGE ANDREW LUND Trustee
None on record
ISABEL HELEN BURGESS Trustee
BRENTWOOD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
BRENTWOOD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
HARALD JOHN LUND Trustee
None on record
MARY LOUISE FIRTH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.02k £3.10k £3.61k £4.02k £4.14k
Total expenditure £4.80k £2.96k £3.36k £4.10k £3.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Far End House
1 Arbury Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2JB
Phone:
07758321569
Website:

No information available