Linked charities THE POOR'S GROUND(GREAT CHEVERELL)
Charity number: 202380

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL OF 12 MAY 1925,INCLOSURE AWARD DATED 18 APRIL 1798 AND SCHEME OF 11TH FEBRUARY 1991
Charitable objects
CLOTHES AND BREAD FOR THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF GREAT CHEVERELL. FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE POOR'S GROUND: COMMISSIONERS' SCHEME OF 11 FEBRUARY 1991.
Area of benefit
GREAT CHEVERELL
Registration history
- 16 April 1962 : Standard registration
- 11 February 1991 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.