THE TOWN HALL

Charity Number: 202405
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Protect & preserve the town hall & Buttercross in Witney. Any surplus funds may be used for the general benefit of the inhabitants of Witney.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,364
Total expenditure: £1,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Crouch Trustee 17 May 2023
THE WITNEY TOWN CHARITY
Received: On time
WITNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sandra Simpson Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Owen Collins Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
Amanda Collicutt Trustee 28 February 2019
THE WITNEY TOWN CHARITY
Received: On time
WITNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LESLEY JOY SEMAINE Trustee
None on record
DEAN SEMAINE Trustee
None on record
HARRY EAGLESTONE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.79k £13.76k £19.01k £13.85k £16.36k
Total expenditure £944 £6.87k £1.96k £23.75k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 February 2025 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TOWN HALL
MARKET SQUARE
WITNEY
OXON
OX28 6AG
Phone:
01993704379
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available