DUNSTALL ALLOTMENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages allotments and provides apprentice grant to students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 April 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Noble | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Alastair Burn | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Christopher Corbin | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Elmer | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Alan Dennis | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Marco Caffarelli | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Glenda Preece | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD RADCLIFFE | Trustee | 07 February 2013 |
|
|||||||||
VANESSA BRUYNEEL-SMITH | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
PAULINE WILKES | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
DERRICK SIDNEY BECKETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | £967 | £947 | £840 | £1.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147 | £453 | £0 | £0 | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23RD AUGUST 1907 AND SCHEME OF 15TH DECEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
(1) IN ASSISTING PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINE THE AGE OF 25 YEARS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF ISLEHAM WHOE ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE PREPARING FO, ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH OUTFITS OR BY PAYING FEES, TRAVELLING OR MAINTENANCE EXPENSES, OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OR TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR LIVING AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. (2) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
ISLEHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Beeches
32 Mill Street
ELY
CB7 5RY
- Phone:
- 01638781687
- Email:
- islehampcfinance@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window