Accounts and annual returns THE PETER HERVE BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity Number: 202443
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 17 July 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 29 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 10 September 2015 On Time