THE BROADCLYST FUND

Charity Number: 202470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to residents of Broadclyst who are old, sick or with disabilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,273
Total expenditure: £6,079

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BROAD CLYST SICK POOR FUND (Previous name)
  • BROADCLYST RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Henrietta Miriam Sansbury Chair 21 November 2017
None on record
Kerry Jackson Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Rev Marc Richard Kerslake Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Natasha Jane Curwood Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Vaughan Trustee 16 June 2015
None on record
MRS MARY STIFF Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.23k £5.96k £4.78k £2.09k £5.27k
Total expenditure £1.95k £5.80k £1.74k £4.33k £6.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 West Clyst Barnyard
West Clyst
EXETER
EX1 3TR
Phone:
01392466808
Website:

No information available