MOBBS MEMORIAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support any charitable objects within such parts of the counties of Bucks and Berks as are within a radius of 35 miles from parish church of Stoke Poges and to establish and to support or aid in the establishment and support of any charitable associations or institutions and to subscribe or guarantee money for charitable purposes in any way connected with the purposes of the Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 29 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA GREENSLADE | Chair | 16 February 2004 |
|
|
||||
WILL GREENSLADE | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER MOBBS | Trustee | 01 September 2008 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS MOBBS | Trustee | 16 February 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.38k | £86.29k | £105.18k | £109.11k | £111.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.46k | £65.58k | £169.70k | £157.86k | £140.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1956 AND AMENDED 12TH JANUARY 1973
Charitable objects
A. TO ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF (I) THE ANCIENT CHURCH OF ST. GILES, STOKE POGES AND ANY AUXILIARY CHURCH OR CHURCH BUILDINGS AND THE SERVICES THEREIN. (II) THE CHURCH-YARD AND EXTENSIONS THEREOF IN WHICH THOMAS GRAY WROTE HIS ELEGY. (III) THE DEDICATED GARDENS OF REMEMBRANCE FOR THE BURIAL OF ASHES ON THE WEST SIDE OF THE CHURCHYARD. (IV) THE NATIONAL TRUST FIELD ON THE EAST SIDE. B. TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE OBJECTS WITHIN SUCH PARTS OF THE COUNTIES OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND BERKSHIRE AS ARE WITHIN A RADIUS OF 35 MILES FROM THE PARISH CHURCH OF STOKE POGES.
Area of benefit
STOKE POGES AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Victoria House
26 Queen Victoria Street
Reading
Berkshire
RG1 1TG
- Phone:
- 0118 957 3238
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window