THOMAS PEACHEY'S CHARITY

Charity number: 202480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Soham United Charities consider and support applications for financial help only from residents of Soham.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,089
Total expenditure: £3,541

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andew Fleet Trustee 20 January 2021
None on record
ROSEMARY RUTH AITCHISON Trustee
SOHAM RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCH CHARITIES(SOHAM)
Received: On time
SOHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
MR GEOFF FISHER Trustee
CHURCH CHARITIES(SOHAM)
Received: On time
SOHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
PHILIP STEWART LANE Trustee
CHURCH CHARITIES(SOHAM)
Received: On time
SOHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
PETER DENNIS TAYLOR Trustee
SOHAM RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCH CHARITIES(SOHAM)
Received: On time
SOHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.90k £7.90k £12.12k £8.07k £8.09k
Total expenditure £6.29k £14.68k £6.95k £5.76k £3.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2022 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 September 2022 675 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
79 Ely Road
Little Downham
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB6 2SN
Phone:
01353 699043
Website:

No information available