Financial history THE DORSET ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED (INCORPORATING DORSET TAPES FOR THE HANDICAPPED)

Charity number: 202524
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £45.34k £96.97k £77.78k £71.35k £33.16k
Total expenditure £23.74k £127.24k £122.43k £104.99k £70.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A