Governing document THE DORSET ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED (INCORPORATING DORSET TAPES FOR THE HANDICAPPED)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 21ST JULY 1953,4TH SEPTEMBER 1963,23RD OCTOBER 1980,25TH SEPTEMBER 1981 AND SCHEME OF 11TH OCTOBER 1978, 24TH OCTOBER 1985 2ND NOVEMBER 1993 2ND NOVEMBER 1994, 27 OCTOBER 1997 26 OCTOBER 1998, 24 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
GENERALLY TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DORSET AND (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN PARTICULAR - PLEASE SEE CONSTITUTION AMENDED OCTOBER 2002
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF DORSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.