Financial history CHERITON FITZPAINE PARISH HALL

Charity number: 202545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £18.62k £17.77k £26.17k £21.28k £29.03k
Total expenditure £17.85k £7.38k £14.30k £17.75k £25.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50 £11.38k £17.23k £2.67k N/A