Financial history FARINGDON WAR MEMORIAL

Charity Number: 202549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2 £10.00k £0 £1 £36
Total expenditure £0 £7.10k £0 £4.71k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A