ST KEVERNE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 202605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Award money to deserving individuals or organisations providing for individuals in need, in accord with the wishes of the persons who left the monies in trust "for the poor of the Parish".

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £350
Total expenditure: £200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 January 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger Eveleigh Richards Chair 15 November 2021
CAR PARK CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
ST KEVERNE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Karen Richards Trustee 26 June 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. KEVERNE
Received: On time
ST KEVERNE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Frederick John Barry Sherriff Trustee 05 May 2022
ST KEVERNE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ST KEVERNE PARISH HALL
Received: On time
SARAH LYNE Trustee 15 November 2021
ST KEVERNE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ST KEVERNE PARISH HALL
Received: On time
CAR PARK CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
Kathleen Dewar Trustee 15 November 2021
ST KEVERNE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £654 £667 £690 £698 £350
Total expenditure £610 £0 £0 £770 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 09 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 23 MAY 1972
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR THE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY CONSISTS OF CHARITIES PREVIOUSLY REGISTERED UNDER NOS. 204251, 261879, 1007113, 1007114 AND 1007115
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. KEVERNE
Registration history
  • 03 January 1992 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Victoria House
The Square
St. Keverne
HELSTON
Cornwall
TR12 6ND
Phone:
01326280890
Website:

No information available