DURSLEY TOWN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dursley Town Trust maintains Dursley Town Hall and Market Place and Jacob's House and Dursley Heritage Centre all being in the centre of Dursley. A sub committee runs Dursley Heritage Centre. The Trust makes the Town Hall and Market Place available for commercial and charitable use as a meeting place and market centre. It leases Jacob's House to Dursley own Council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 13 March 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dursley Town Council | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.77k | £35.35k | £30.69k | £13.96k | £15.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.68k | £10.30k | £11.57k | £22.13k | £14.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £7.13k | £8.28k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.67k | £20.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10 APR 2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09 FEB 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17 NOV 2022 as amended on 23 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, THE MARKET HOUSE AND TOWN HALL AT DURSLEY, GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
DURSLEY, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dursley Town Council
Jacobs House
Castle Street
DURSLEY
Gloucestershire
GL11 4BS
- Phone:
- 01453547758
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window