PALMER CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes donations to Trowbridge almshouse trusts for the improvement of accommodation. Makes donations to Action on Homelessness in Trowbridge. Makes donations to Elderly Persons' Day Club in Trowbridge .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 February 1962: Standard registration
- 16 September 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE PALMER CHARITY (Working name)
- PALMERS ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62k | £1.97k | £1.99k | £2.13k | £2.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.85k | £2.78k | £621 | £5.67k | £550 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 02 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | 02 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 11 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 16 March 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 02 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 14 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 15 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | 15 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18TH. JULY 1995
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR MEN OR WOMEN OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO HAVE RESIDED IN PARISH OF TROWBRIDGE FOR NOT LESS THAN 20 YEARS PRECEDING TIME OF APPOINTMENT AND ARE EITHER OVER THE AGE OF 60 YEARS OR INCAPACITATED FOR ACTIVE WORK. PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO ANY PERSON WHO SHALL HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED BY GEORGE LLEWELLEN PALMER. PAYMENTS TO ALMSPEOPLE OF $1 PER CALENDER MONTH.
Area of benefit
TROWBRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window